blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0938854

EP0938854 - Treatment elements for brushes for car wash or polishing installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WashTec Holding GmbH
Argonstrasse 7
86153 Augsburg / DE
[2000/52]
Former [1999/35]For all designated states
California Kleindienst Holding GmbH
Argonstrasse 7
86153 Augsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Windel, Günter
Steinstrasse 15
63825 Schöllkrippen / DE
[1999/35]
Representative(s)Rapp, Bertram, et al
Charrier Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Fuggerstrasse 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]Rapp, Bertram, Dr., et al
Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Anwaltshaus Volkhartstrasse 7
86152 Augsburg / DE
Former [1999/35]Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H.-D. Ernicke Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date99103599.924.02.1999
[1999/35]
Priority number, dateDE1998206221U04.04.1998         Original published format: DE 29806221 U
DE1998203546U28.02.1998         Original published format: DE 29803546 U
[1999/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0938854
Date:01.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0938854
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0938854
Date:30.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:A46B13/00
[1999/35]
CPC:
A46B13/003 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/03]
Former [1999/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Behandlungselemente für Bürsten von Autowasch- oder Polieranlagen[1999/35]
English:Treatment elements for brushes for car wash or polishing installation[1999/35]
French:Eléments de traitement pour brosses pour installations de lavage ou de polissage de véhicules[1999/35]
Examination procedure04.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
21.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2002Fee for grant paid
23.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT30.01.2003
BE28.02.2003
[2004/28]
Former [2003/29]PT30.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US4338698  (BEER CARL C, et al) [A] 1-7* abstract *;
 [A]DE19646783  (WESUMAT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0787446  (NOWITECK ESTABLISHMENT [LI]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]US5699579  (BURGER JOERG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.