EP1031469 - Method and device for the detection of an object or a person in the interior of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Christoph, Dr. 20-14, Higashi-Gotanda 3 Tokyo 141-8641 Shinagawa-Ku / JP | 02 /
Hamperl, Reinhard Buchenstrasse 5 93096 Köfering / DE | 03 /
Rösl, Reinhard Ulmenweg 2a 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | 04 /
Waldmann, Alexander Raiffeisenstrasse 9 93059 Regensburg / DE | 05 /
Stierle, Thomas Lappersdorferstrasse 29 93059 Regensburg / DE | 06 /
Mader, Gerhard, Dr. Ringstrasse 21 93107 Thalmassing / DE | [2000/35] | Application number, filing date | 99103696.3 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031469 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031469 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/00 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
B60R21/015 (EP,US);
A01K61/73 (KR);
E02B3/043 (KR);
E02B3/046 (KR);
E02B3/129 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/25] |
Former [2001/20] | |||
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erfassen eines Objektes oder einer Person im Innenraum eines Fahrzeugs | [2000/35] | English: | Method and device for the detection of an object or a person in the interior of a vehicle | [2000/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la détection d'un objet ou d'une personne à l'intérieur d'un véhicule | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 01.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   19.04.2001 | 12.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   19.04.2001 | 12.04.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   19.04.2001 | 12.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   19.04.2001 | 12.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09240417 ; | [A]JPH0920206 ; | [A]US5482314 (CORRADO ANTHONY P [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 6, line 26 - line 41 *; | [A]DE19757137 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [A] 1,11 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 28 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 098, no. 001, & JP09240417 A 19970916 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 097, no. 005, & JP09020206 A 19970121 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [A] 1,11 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0669227 |