Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0942448

EP0942448 - Isolating switch with fuses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2008
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Blaimer, Gerhard
Nelkenweg 15
92245 Kümmersbruck / DE
02 / Hunner, Winfried
Othmayrstrasse 95
92224 Amberg / DE
[1999/37]
Application number, filing date99103698.925.02.1999
[1999/37]
Priority number, dateDE1998204247U10.03.1998         Original published format: DE 29804247 U
[1999/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0942448
Date:15.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0942448
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0942448
Date:08.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01H31/12, H01H9/34
[1999/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   NL [2000/37]
Former [1999/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sicherungstrennschalter[1999/37]
English:Isolating switch with fuses[1999/37]
French:Sectionneur à fusibles[1999/37]
Examination procedure31.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
09.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2007Fee for grant paid
21.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
17.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
20.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL08.08.2007
AT25.02.2008
CH29.02.2008
LI29.02.2008
[2009/30]
Former [2008/48]NL08.08.2007
CH29.02.2008
LI29.02.2008
Former [2008/16]NL08.08.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3918816  (EFEN ELEKTROTECH FAB [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claims 1-4,12,13 *;
 [Y]DE9309654U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE2544251  (EFEN ELEKTROTECH FAB) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE6939831U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE1899474U  (NEU LEOPOLD [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *