Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0939373

EP0939373 - Microcomputer and burn-in testing method for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ajiro, Kazuyoshi
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/35]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99103707.825.02.1999
[1999/35]
Priority number, dateJP1998004309025.02.1998         Original published format: JP 4309098
[1999/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0939373
Date:01.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0939373
Date:08.12.1999
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0939373
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: A3 RE ???tdavalues.publicationType.A3 RE??? 
No.:EP0939373
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/273, G06F11/24, G06F11/267
[2000/03]
Former International [1999/35]G06F11/273, G06F11/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/39]
Former [1999/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mikrorechner und sein Einbrenntestverfahren[1999/35]
English:Microcomputer and burn-in testing method for the same[1999/35]
French:Micro-ordinateur et procédé de test de vieillissement[1999/35]
Examination procedure15.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
14.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/45]
31.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0018736  (MOTOROLA INC) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 13 * * page 28, line 1 - page 29, line 9 * * claims 1-5,9 *;
 [A]EP0556826  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-12 * abstract *