Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038851

EP1038851 - Process for firing a lumpy, burnable charge expecially limestone, dolomite and magnesite, and a regenerative shaft furnace for carrying out the process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/39]Process for firing a lumpy, fireble charge expecially limestone, dolomite and magnesite, and a regenerative shaft furnace for carrying out the process
[2001/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2002Renewal fee 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zeisel, Peter Dipl.-Ing.
Overhoffstrasse 3
44791 Bochum / DE
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Rainer Harald , et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3
45127 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date99103847.227.02.1999
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038851
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038851
Date:09.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C04B2/12, F27B1/02
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   IT,   LI [2001/19]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Brennen von stückigem Brenngut, insbesondere von Kalkstein, Dolomit und Magnesit, und Regenerativschachtofen zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2000/39]
English:Process for firing a lumpy, burnable charge expecially limestone, dolomite and magnesite, and a regenerative shaft furnace for carrying out the process[2001/09]
French:Procédé pour calciner une charge calcinable en morceaux, spécialement calcaire, dolomite et magnesite, et four à couve à régénération pour mettre à exécution le procédé[2000/39]
Former [2000/39]Process for firing a lumpy, fireble charge expecially limestone, dolomite and magnesite, and a regenerative shaft furnace for carrying out the process
Examination procedure26.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/39]
11.08.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
23.06.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.06.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
13.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2000Fee for grant paid
04.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5460517  (SCHEIBENREIF KARL [CH], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2523569  (DOLOMITWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * page 3, line 12 - line 19 * * page 6, line 1 - line 20 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 2 *;
 [A]CH345635  (SOLVAY [BE]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 61 - page 2, line 15 * * page 2, line 51 - line 70 * * page 2 *;
 [A]FR2436346  (MAERZ OFENBAU [CH]) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 28 - line 36 * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 12 * * figure 4; claim 11 *;
 [A]US4534731  (FUESSL ERWIN [CH], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 32 - line 40 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 6 *;
 [A]EP0141198  (RHEINISCHE KALKSTEINWERKE [DE]) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 19 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 16 *