Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035462

EP1035462 - Method for checking user access [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12, Postfach 130-251
D-64297 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/48]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12, Postfach 130-251
D-64297 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12, Postfach 130-251
D-64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Beesley, Neil
F302 Mountain Ridgebrook 210Mountain Park Blvd SW
Issaquah, WA 98027 / US
02 / Gärtner, Dietmar
Weimarer Strasse 56
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
03 / Holme, James
Waldstrasse 51
64404 Bickenbach / DE
04 / Kennedy, Terence
Korellweg 16
64297 Darmstadt / DE
05 / Kessler, Dieter
Moselstrasse 29
64331 Weiterstadt / DE
06 / Vogler, Thomas
Frankfurter Strasse 74
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99103951.208.03.1999
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035462
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035462
Date:29.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Zugriffsprüfung eines Anwenders[2000/37]
English:Method for checking user access[2000/37]
French:Méthode de vérification d'accès d'un utilisateur[2000/37]
Examination procedure09.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
11.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2006Fee for grant paid
02.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.11.2006
BE29.11.2006
CH29.11.2006
CY29.11.2006
FI29.11.2006
FR29.11.2006
IT29.11.2006
LI29.11.2006
NL29.11.2006
DK28.02.2007
SE28.02.2007
GR01.03.2007
IE08.03.2007
LU08.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT30.04.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/52]AT29.11.2006
BE29.11.2006
CH29.11.2006
FI29.11.2006
FR29.11.2006
IT29.11.2006
LI29.11.2006
NL29.11.2006
DK28.02.2007
SE28.02.2007
GR01.03.2007
IE08.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT30.04.2007
Former [2008/23]AT29.11.2006
BE29.11.2006
CH29.11.2006
FI29.11.2006
IT29.11.2006
LI29.11.2006
NL29.11.2006
DK28.02.2007
SE28.02.2007
GR01.03.2007
IE08.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT30.04.2007
FR20.07.2007
Former [2008/21]AT29.11.2006
BE29.11.2006
CH29.11.2006
FI29.11.2006
IT29.11.2006
LI29.11.2006
NL29.11.2006
DK28.02.2007
SE28.02.2007
GR01.03.2007
IE08.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT30.04.2007
Former [2008/16]AT29.11.2006
BE29.11.2006
CH29.11.2006
FI29.11.2006
IT29.11.2006
LI29.11.2006
NL29.11.2006
DK28.02.2007
SE28.02.2007
IE08.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT30.04.2007
Former [2007/30]AT29.11.2006
BE29.11.2006
CH29.11.2006
FI29.11.2006
LI29.11.2006
NL29.11.2006
SE28.02.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]US5586260  (HU WEI-MING [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 49 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 4; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US5872917  (HELLMAN MARTIN E [US]) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 29 - line 65; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5684950  (DARE TIMOTHY S [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 25 - line 47 *