EP0948977 - Video game machine and computer-readable recording medium containing video game program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudo, Shinichi 1-8-501, Kikusui 4jo 2-chome, Shiroishi-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkai-do / JP | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104073.4 | 18.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | JP19980070925 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7092598 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0948977 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0948977 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/22 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F9/24 (KR);
A63F13/493 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F13/58 (US);
A63F13/833 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/04] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Videospielvorrichtung und computerlesbares Aufzeichungsmedium für Videospielprogramm | [1999/41] | English: | Video game machine and computer-readable recording medium containing video game program | [1999/41] | French: | Machine de jeu vidéo et support d'enregistrement lisible par ordinateur pour programme de jeu vidéo | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 05.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 15.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/24] | 10.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/24] | 12.01.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.12.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9625211 (NAMCO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5-8; | [XA]US5720663 (NAKATANI HAJIME [JP], et al) [X] 5,6 * column 9, line 4 - line 18 * [A] 1,3,7,8; | US5947823 [ ] (NIMURA SHINOBU [JP]) [ ] * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 4 * * column 9, line 21 - line 24 *; | [A] - "Tekken 2", [ONLINE], (19961126), URL: psx.ign.com/reviews/475.html, (20010306), XP002162180 [A] 1,3,5-8 * page 1, paragraph 3 * |