Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0943848

EP0943848 - A method of producing a spiral wound gasket and a device for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD.
11-48 Nonakaminami 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/38]For all designated states
NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO. LTD.
11-48 Nonakaminami 2-chome Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashiguchi, Hideto Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd.
Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami
Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Takaoka, Masahiko Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd.
Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami
Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
03 / Okada, Keiji Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd.
Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami
Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
04 / Kato, Shoji Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd.
Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami
Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
05 / Konaka, Masao Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd.
Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami
Sanda-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
[1999/38]
Representative(s)Fleuchaus, Leo , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/38]Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Melchiorstrasse 42
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date99104312.603.03.1999
[1999/38]
Priority number, dateJP1998008941817.03.1998         Original published format: JP 8941898
[1999/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0943848
Date:22.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0943848
Date:05.07.2000
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0943848
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/12, B21D11/06
[1999/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/11]
Former [1999/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer spiralförmigen Dichtung und Vorrichtung und Einrichtung zur Herstellung derselben[1999/38]
English:A method of producing a spiral wound gasket and a device for producing the same[1999/38]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une garniture d'étanchéité spiralée et appareillage pour la production de celle-ci[1999/38]
Examination procedure17.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/38]
25.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2004Fee for grant paid
17.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5683091  (ISOE TAKAHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 10 * * figures 7-9 *;
 [A]EP0707906  (AISA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,6 * column 4, lines 34-37 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 53 * * figures 2,4A,4C *;
 [A]GB2258018  (T & N TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraphs 2-5 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 2 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]DE3134829  (KEMPCHEN & CO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2,4,5 *
by applicantJPH0833180
 JPH1089418