blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0940250

EP0940250 - Curtain for high shirrable partition curtains for sports halls, exhibition halls, factory halls or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trenomat GmbH & Co. KG
Ladestrasse 11
42327 Wuppertal / DE
[1999/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Knittel, Klaus Walter
Herzkamper Strasse 56 A
42281 Wuppertal / DE
[1999/36]
Representative(s)Ludewig, Karlheinrich
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse
Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel
Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig
Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]Ludewig, Karlheinrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date99104414.005.03.1999
[1999/36]
Priority number, dateDE199810948406.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19809484
[1999/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0940250
Date:08.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0940250
Date:30.08.2000
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0940250
Date:28.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:B32B27/12, A47H23/10
[2000/35]
CPC:
B32B27/12 (EP); A47H23/10 (EP)
Former IPC [1999/36]B32B27/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   LI,   NL [2001/20]
Former [1999/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorhangbahn für Hochraffbare Trennvorhänge für Sporthallen, Veranstaltungs- und Messehallen, Industriehallen, Säle od. dgl.[1999/36]
English:Curtain for high shirrable partition curtains for sports halls, exhibition halls, factory halls or the like[1999/36]
French:Rideau pour rideaux de séparation hautement plissables pour salles de sports, halls de manifestations, halls de foires, halles ou similaire[1999/36]
Examination procedure28.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
19.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2003Fee for grant paid
18.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]NL9201117  (STERTIL BV) [A] 1-3* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.