Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0940440 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0940440



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 752
17.05.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
10.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.04.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 46
22.01.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
18.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
14.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
14.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 32
14.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
14.12.2009 Previously filed application Appeal 33
03.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.11.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.10.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.10.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
08.05.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.04.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
28.01.2009 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.12.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.12.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.10.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2008 Claims Appeal 1
29.09.2008 Claims Appeal 1
29.09.2008 Claims Appeal 1
29.09.2008 Description Appeal 4
29.09.2008 Description Appeal 1
29.09.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
29.09.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
10.09.2008 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
03.09.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.09.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.08.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2008 Annex Appeal 1
07.08.2008 Annex Appeal 1
07.08.2008 Annex Appeal 1
07.08.2008 Annex Appeal 1
07.08.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
21.07.2008 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
08.07.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2008 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.02.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
18.01.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.01.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
20.12.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.12.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
08.11.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
19.10.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
19.10.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.10.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.09.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2007 Claims Opposition 1
10.08.2007 Claims Opposition 2
10.08.2007 Description Opposition 3
10.08.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
19.07.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.07.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
06.07.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.07.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
06.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 6
06.07.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
22.07.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.07.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
12.07.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.11.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
31.10.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
31.10.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
31.10.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
31.10.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 21
09.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.04.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.04.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 19
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.03.2005 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
16.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
07.05.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.03.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.03.2004 Translation of priority document Search / examination 61
16.01.2004 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
16.01.2004 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
14.01.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.01.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.01.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.11.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.11.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
06.11.2003 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
06.11.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 47
30.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
13.12.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.12.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.07.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.09.1999 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.08.1999 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
28.07.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.05.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.05.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.05.1999 European search report Search / examination 2
05.03.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
05.03.1999 Description Search / examination 45
05.03.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6