blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0955202

EP0955202 - Method for adjusting the tilting angle of a current collector and apparatus for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FIAT-SIG Schienenfahrzeuge AG
8212 Neuhausen / CH
[1999/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Berger, Thomas
Bruderhofstrasse 14
78224 Singen / DE
02 / Brutti Erich
Schützenstrasse 41A
8212 Neuhausen / CH
03 / Kwasnicki, Elias
Büchelerstrasse 7
8212 Neuhausen / CH
[1999/45]
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte
Postfach
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/45]Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach
8050 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99104559.208.03.1999
[1999/45]
Priority number, dateDE199811995905.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19819959
[1999/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0955202
Date:10.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0955202
Date:30.08.2000
[2000/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:B60L5/19
[1999/45]
CPC:
B60L5/19 (EP); B60L2200/26 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/20]
Former [1999/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Einstellung der Neigung eines Stromabnehmers und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[1999/45]
English:Method for adjusting the tilting angle of a current collector and apparatus for carrying out this method[1999/45]
French:Méthode pour ajuster l'inclinaison d'une pantographe et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode[1999/45]
Examination procedure01.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/01]
13.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.04.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.04.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.04.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9743139  (SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH08154303  (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19614554  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,2,7,12 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.