Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995675

EP0995675 - Method for reducing wave resistance in airplane [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.08.2004  [2004/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kumata, Hirotaka, c/o Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Katahira, Kiyoshi, c/o Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Wakita, Shuichi, c/o Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
04 / Nishikawa, Toshihiro c/o Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
c/o Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Straße 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date99104595.608.03.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998029713119.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29713198
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995675
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995675
Date:28.03.2001
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995675
Date:20.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:B64D27/18, B64D27/02, B64D29/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/51]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verminderung des Wellenwiderstandes eines Flugzeuges[2000/17]
English:Method for reducing wave resistance in airplane[2000/17]
French:Procédé por la réduction de la résistance d'onde sur des avions[2000/17]
Examination procedure27.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
25.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2003Fee for grant paid
20.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4449680  (GRATZER LOUIS B [US], et al) [DA] 1,6,9 * the whole document * * figures 3-9 *;
 [DA]US4314681  (KUTNEY JOHN T) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document * * figure 6 *;
 [DA]US4311289  (FINCH THOMAS) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document * * figures 2A,2B,3 *;
 [A]EP0432972  (BRITISH AEROSPACE) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4311289
 US4449680
 US4314681
 US4171786
 US3727862