blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0923240 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0923240



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1114
26.09.2014 Registration under R 23 EPC Search / examination 2
25.07.2014 R23 Annex C Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 R23 Deficiencies Search / examination 2
18.09.2013 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.11.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
18.10.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.10.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.10.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
02.10.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
02.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.07.2012 Annex Search / examination 4
27.07.2012 Registration under R 23 EPC Search / examination 2
06.07.2012 Annex Search / examination 17
06.07.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
05.07.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.07.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.07.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
05.07.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 116
04.07.2012 Annex Search / examination 17
04.07.2012 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
22.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
22.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
22.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Description Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Description Search / examination 3
22.05.2012 Description Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Description Search / examination 10
22.05.2012 Description Search / examination 6
22.05.2012 Description Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Description Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Description Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.05.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.03.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
08.02.2012 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 18
08.02.2012 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
12.01.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
06.01.2012 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 4
12.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.12.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
12.12.2011 Claims Appeal 3
12.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.12.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.10.2011 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 3
10.10.2011 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
10.10.2011 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
13.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
13.09.2011 Claims Appeal 3
13.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.09.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 5
02.07.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.06.2011 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
22.06.2011 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
09.06.2011 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.01.2011 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
13.01.2011 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
16.04.2009 Annex Search / examination 2
16.04.2009 Registration under R 23 EPC Search / examination 2
26.02.2009 Annex Search / examination 34
26.02.2009 Annex Search / examination 5
26.02.2009 Annex Search / examination 4
26.02.2009 Annex Search / examination 8
26.02.2009 Annex Search / examination 12
26.02.2009 Annex Search / examination 12
26.02.2009 Annex Search / examination 34
26.02.2009 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 3
26.02.2009 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 3
26.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 24
26.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 24
23.12.2008 Annex Search / examination 62
23.12.2008 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
24.09.2008 R23 Annex A Search / examination 1
24.09.2008 R23 Annex B Search / examination 1
24.09.2008 R23 Annex C Search / examination 1
19.09.2008 Annex Search / examination 1
19.09.2008 Annex Search / examination 2
25.07.2008 Annex Search / examination 4
25.07.2008 Annex Search / examination 28
25.07.2008 Annex Search / examination 16
25.07.2008 Annex Search / examination 52
25.07.2008 Annex Search / examination 6
25.07.2008 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
06.02.2008 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
01.02.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.01.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.01.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.10.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
18.10.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
11.09.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
20.08.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.08.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.08.2007 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
26.06.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
18.06.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
18.06.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
18.06.2007 Means of redress Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.06.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.04.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
17.04.2007 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
23.03.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
19.03.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 11
19.08.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.08.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
11.08.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
11.08.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.08.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.12.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.12.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
24.12.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
24.12.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
24.12.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
24.12.2005 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
25.06.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.06.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
29.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.03.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.03.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.03.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.01.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.12.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
16.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.08.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.12.2003 Claims Search / examination 6
11.12.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.12.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
24.10.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.10.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.10.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.08.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.04.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.02.2003 General enquiry Search / examination 1
03.08.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
22.06.1999 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.05.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
29.04.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
29.04.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
06.04.1999 Priority document Search / examination 142
08.03.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 10
08.03.1999 Description Search / examination 66
08.03.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.1999 Drawings Search / examination 47
08.03.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
08.03.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.03.1999 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6