blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0923240


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
20.09.2013 No opposition filed within time limit published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
09.08.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
28.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2013  [2013/31]
07.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.07.2013  [2013/28]
31.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2013  [2013/27]
10.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
03.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
19.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
12.10.2012 (Expected) grant published on  14.11.2012  [2012/46]
08.10.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.10.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.07.2012 Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
04.07.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.05.2012 Change - classification published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
25.05.2012 Change - German title published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
25.05.2012 Change - English title published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
25.05.2012 Change - French title published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
23.05.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.03.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.02.2012 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
13.01.2012 Change - applicant published on  15.02.2012  [2012/07]
13.10.2011 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2011 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
17.06.2011 Change: Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2011 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.04.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.06.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
11.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2009 Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution published on  13.05.2009  [2009/20]
09.04.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
09.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2008 Change: Appeal number
06.11.2007 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
14.09.2007 Change - applicant published on  17.10.2007  [2007/42]
25.08.2007 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
13.06.2007 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.06.2007 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
23.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.08.2006 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2006 Change - inventor published on  22.02.2006  [2006/08]
25.06.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.03.2005 Deletion: Reply to examination report
02.03.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.12.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.08.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.12.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.10.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.08.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.05.2003 Renewal fee
28.03.2003 Examination report or reply
28.03.2003 First examination report
15.11.2002 Change - earlier application published on  02.01.2003  [2003/01]
28.05.2002 Renewal fee
22.05.2001 Renewal fee
23.05.2000 Renewal fee
09.03.2000 Change - extension states
07.01.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  23.02.2000 [2000/08]
18.08.1999 Renewal fee
11.05.1999 Renewal fee
30.04.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.06.1999 [1999/24]
30.04.1999 Request for examination filed published on  16.06.1999 [1999/24]