blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0923240 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP94919117 EP99104609 EP99104610



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2010021133Global Dossier 28.01.2010A1
Priority number Date
US57464609 06.10.2009
US20609305 16.08.2005
US7095898 01.05.1998
US96534501 26.09.2001
US6286693 17.05.1993
US80109907 07.05.2007
US73365900 07.12.2000
US75397096 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008025696Global Dossier 31.01.2008A1
Priority number Date
US20609305 16.08.2005
US7095898 01.05.1998
US87005707 10.10.2007
US96534501 26.09.2001
US6286693 17.05.1993
US73365900 07.12.2000
US75397096 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7706533Global Dossier 27.04.2010B2
US2007211899 13.09.2007A1
Priority number Date
US20609305 16.08.2005
US7095898 01.05.1998
US96534501 26.09.2001
US6286693 17.05.1993
US73365900 07.12.2000
US75397096 04.12.1996
US80089607 07.05.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7620178Global Dossier 17.11.2009B2
US2007206794 06.09.2007A1
Priority number Date
US20609305 16.08.2005
US7095898 01.05.1998
US96534501 26.09.2001
US6286693 17.05.1993
US80109907 07.05.2007
US73365900 07.12.2000
US75397096 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7492896Global Dossier 17.02.2009B2
US2007211898 13.09.2007A1
Priority number Date
US20609305 16.08.2005
US7095898 01.05.1998
US96534501 26.09.2001
US6286693 17.05.1993
US73365900 07.12.2000
US75397096 04.12.1996
US80090507 07.05.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7352863Global Dossier 01.04.2008B2
US2006045266 02.03.2006A1
Priority number Date
US20609305 16.08.2005
US7095898 01.05.1998
US96534501 26.09.2001
US6286693 17.05.1993
US73365900 07.12.2000
US75397096 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3272363BGlobal Dossier 08.04.2002B2
JPH09502575 11.03.1997A
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0923241Global Dossier 31.07.2002B1
EP0923241 23.06.1999A3
EP0923241 16.06.1999A2
Priority number Date
EP94919117 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0706740Global Dossier 02.11.2005B2
EP0706740 29.09.1999B1
EP0706740 17.04.1996A1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0923240Global Dossier 14.11.2012B1
EP0923240 16.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
EP94919117 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU702568B 25.02.1999B2
AU7506498 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
AU7017194 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU702665B 25.02.1999B2
AU8186998 15.10.1998A
Priority number Date
AU7017194 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU702667B 25.02.1999B2
AU7506398 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
AU7017194 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU708661B 12.08.1999B2
AU7506698 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
AU7506698 08.07.1998
AU7017194 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU710279B 16.09.1999B2
AU7506598 01.10.1998A
Priority number Date
AU7017194 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU710403B 16.09.1999B2
AU7506298 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
AU7017194 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7017194 12.12.1994A
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9406527 02.01.1996A
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2162367 14.12.2004C
CA2162367 24.11.1994A1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2417176 01.02.2005C
CA2417176 24.11.1994A1
Priority number Date
CA2162367 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2417180 02.08.2005C
CA2417180 24.11.1994A1
Priority number Date
CA2162367 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2476252 05.04.2005C
CA2476252 24.11.1994A1
Priority number Date
CA2162367 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69420964D 04.11.1999D1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69420964T 14.09.2006T3
DE69420964T 06.04.2000T2
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0706740T 05.12.2005T4
DK0706740T 10.04.2000T3
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GR3032183T 27.04.2000T3
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1013756 16.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ267775 24.10.1997A
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ328310 24.10.1997A
Priority number Date
NZ26777594 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ328311 24.10.1997A
Priority number Date
NZ26777594 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ328312 25.11.1998A
Priority number Date
NZ26777594 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ328313 24.10.1997A
Priority number Date
NZ26777594 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ328314 24.10.1997A
Priority number Date
NZ26777594 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL174624B 31.08.1998B1
PL311704 04.03.1996A1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL174897B 30.10.1998B1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL174901B 30.10.1998B1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL175324B 31.12.1998B1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL175330B 31.12.1998B1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL175346B 31.12.1998B1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2130237 10.05.1999C1
Priority number Date
US9405088 09.05.1994
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5625691 29.04.1997A
Priority number Date
US43328395 02.05.1995
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5633927 27.05.1997A
Priority number Date
US43557595 05.05.1995
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5748733 05.05.1998A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
US75397096 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6285765 04.09.2001B1
Priority number Date
US7095898 01.05.1998
US6286693 17.05.1993
US75397096 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6501842 31.12.2002B2
US2001026617 04.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
US7095898 01.05.1998
US6286693 17.05.1993
US73365900 07.12.2000
US75397096 04.12.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7085380 01.08.2006B2
US2002018564 14.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
US7095898 01.05.1998
US96534501 26.09.2001
US6286693 17.05.1993
US73365900 07.12.2000
US75397096 04.12.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9427406Global Dossier 19.01.1995A3
WO9427406 24.11.1994A2
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100397122BGlobal Dossier 06.09.2003B1
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3425850BGlobal Dossier 14.07.2003B2
JPH1056611 24.02.1998A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT185225T 15.10.1999T
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT221713T 15.08.2002T
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1078425C 23.01.2002C
CN1127577 24.07.1996A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1200561C 04.05.2005C
CN1348308 08.05.2002A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1208956C 29.06.2005C
CN1323138 21.11.2001A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69431133D 05.09.2002D1
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69431133T 06.03.2003T2
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EG20806 29.03.2000A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2136200T 01.03.2006T5
ES2136200T 16.11.1999T3
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1045043 19.08.2005A1
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID19985 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID19986 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID19987 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID19988 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID19989 03.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100353565B 24.01.2003B1
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW232110B 11.10.1994B
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5583936 10.12.1996A
Priority number Date
US6286693 17.05.1993
TypeType Earlier application
 EP0706740