blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0923240

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 14.11.2012
 BELapse: 14.11.2012
 CHLapse: 31.05.2013
 DE 
 DKLapse: 14.11.2012
 ESLapse: 25.02.2013
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 15.02.2013
 IELapse: 09.05.2013
 ITLapse: 14.11.2012
 LILapse: 31.05.2013
 LULapse: 09.05.2013
 NLLapse: 14.11.2012
 PTLapse: 14.03.2013
 SELapse: 14.11.2012
Examination procedure02.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE
Date:26.02.2009
ID:02
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE
Date:05.07.2012
[2012/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 13
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 14
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 15
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 16
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 17
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 18
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 19
European patent granted14.11.2012
Appeal following examination16.08.2007APPEAL FILED
18.10.2007APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
14.10.2011COMMUNICATION A.110(2) DISPATCHED
25.01.2012APPEAL RESULT
Opposition procedure15.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit published on 23.10.2013 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
 
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990308
 
Event date:23.02.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
 
Event date:02.01.2003 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION (CORRECTED)
Ref Document Number:706740
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.05.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030402
 
Event date:22.02.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:QUAN, RONALD
 
Event date:17.10.2007 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:MACROVISION CORPORATION
 
Event date:13.05.2009 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON OTHER RIGHTS AND LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION
Free Format Text:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE
Effective DATE:20090226
 
Event date:15.02.2012 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:ROVI SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
 
Event date:23.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 69435387 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04N0005910000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N0005913000
 
Event date:27.06.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 5/913 20060101AFI20120523BHEP
 
Event date:29.08.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON OTHER RIGHTS AND LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION
Free Format Text:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE
Effective DATE:20090226
 
Event date:14.11.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
 
Event date:14.11.2012 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:0706740
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:14.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:15.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 584494 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20121115
 
Event date:19.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:10.01.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 69435387 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20130110
 
Event date:10.04.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL VDEP
Code Expl.:-INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20121114
 
Event date:15.04.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 584494 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20121114
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130225
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121114
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130215
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121114
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130314
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121114
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20130515
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121114
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20130508
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121114
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121114
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20130531
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:23.10.2013 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20130815
 
Event date:12.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 69435387 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20130815
 
Event date:31.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130531
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130531
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130509
 
Event date:09.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69435387 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:10.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69435387 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:28.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20140508
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140508
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140510
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140904 AND 20140910
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130509