Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0923240

EP0923240 - Method and apparatus for defeating a video copy protection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/24]Video copy protection process enhancement
[2012/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2013
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rovi Solutions Corporation
2830 De La Cruz Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
[2012/07]
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
MACROVISION CORPORATION
2830 De La Cruz Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
MACROVISION CORPORATION
1341 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Quan, Ronald
10910 Wunderlich Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2006/08]
Former [1999/24]01 / Wonfor, Peter, J.
962 Malaga
El Granada, CA 94018 / US
02 / Knox, Alistair, J.
102 Loddon Bridge Road
Woddley, Reading Berks RG5 4AW / GB
03 / Corcoran, Jeremy, J.
76 New Peachey Lane
Cowley, Uxbridge, Middlesex UB8 3SY / GB
04 / Ryan, John, O.
22015 Creekside Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / Quan, Ronald
10910 Wunderlich Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Representative(s)Needle, Jacqueline
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/46]Needle, Jacqueline
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London
WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [1999/24]Needle, Jacqueline
W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date99104609.509.05.1994
[1999/24]
Priority number, dateUS1993006286617.05.1993         Original published format: US 62866
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0923240
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0923240
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/913
[2012/26]
Former International [1999/24]H04N5/91
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umgehen von Videokopierschutz[2012/26]
English:Method and apparatus for defeating a video copy protection[2012/26]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour contourner la protection de copie vidéo[2012/26]
Former [1999/24]Verbesserung für Videokopierschutzverfahren
Former [1999/24]Video copy protection process enhancement
Former [1999/24]Amélioration d'un procédé de protection de copie vidéo
Examination procedure08.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/24]
02.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
09.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
22.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2007Date of oral proceedings
18.06.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.06.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2012Fee for grant paid
02.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination16.08.2007Appeal received No.  T0103/08
18.10.2007Statement of grounds filed
14.10.2011Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2011/42]
25.01.2012Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94919117.5  / EP0706740
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19940919117) is  05.12.1997
Opposition(s)15.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 13
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 14
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 15
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 16
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 17
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 18
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 19
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE
Date:26.02.2009
ID:02
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE
Date:05.07.2012
[2012/35]
Former [2009/20]ID:01
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU NL PT SE
Date:26.02.2009
[2012/35]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE09.05.2013
LU09.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/20]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
IE09.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/08]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/24]SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/23]SE14.11.2012
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE14.11.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0189548  (VIDEO PROGRAMM SERVICE VPS [DE]) [A] 1-58 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9209171  (MACROVISION CORP [US]) [A] 1-58 * abstract *;
 [A]US5157510  (QUAN RONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-58 * column A *
 [A]  "COPY PROTECTION FOR VIDEO SIGNALS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19910801), no. 328, page 607, XP000217919 [A] 1-58
ExaminationWO9300769
 EP0255407
 US4631603
 WO9116791
 US4819098
    "MACROVISION DECODER/BLANKER", ELEKTOR, CANTERBURY, GB, (19881001), vol. 14, no. 160, ISSN 0268-4519, pages 44 - 47, XP000046163
    "Specification of Television Standards for 625-Line System I Transmissions in the United Kingdom", SPECIFICATION OF TELEVISION STANDARDS FOR 625-LINE SYSTEM I TRANSMISSIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, London, UK, (19841231),