blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0923241 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0923241



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 277
26.09.2008 R23 Deficiencies Search / examination 2
24.09.2008 R23 Annex C Search / examination 1
04.06.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Request for correction Search / examination 1
29.08.2002 Request for correction Search / examination 4
19.08.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
03.08.2002 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
29.07.2002 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
20.06.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.02.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
01.12.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.08.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.08.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.08.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
03.11.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
03.11.2000 Description Search / examination 3
03.11.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.10.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
05.09.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.08.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.04.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
20.04.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
29.06.1999 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
10.05.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.05.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.05.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
06.05.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.04.1999 Priority document Search / examination 142
08.03.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
08.03.1999 Description Search / examination 15
08.03.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.03.1999 Drawings Search / examination 14
08.03.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
08.03.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.03.1999 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6