blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0923241


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
12.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.01.2004  [2004/05]
10.10.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
26.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
13.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
06.06.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
15.04.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
28.03.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2003  [2003/20]
29.11.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.01.2003  [2003/03]
16.08.2002 Change - applicant published on  02.10.2002  [2002/40]
14.06.2002 (Expected) grant published on  31.07.2002  [2002/31]
28.05.2002 Renewal fee
07.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant
06.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant
22.05.2001 Renewal fee
20.11.2000 Examination report or reply
30.08.2000 Examination report or reply
23.05.2000 Renewal fee
20.04.2000 First examination report
14.04.2000 Examination report or reply
25.08.1999 Renewal fee
07.05.1999 Publication of search report published on  23.06.1999 [1999/25]
30.04.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.06.1999 [1999/24]
30.04.1999 Request for examination filed published on  16.06.1999 [1999/24]
06.04.1999 Renewal fee