Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0923241

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 31.07.2002
 BELapse: 31.07.2002
 CHLapse: 31.07.2002
 DE 
 DKLapse: 31.10.2002
 ESLapse: 30.01.2003
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 31.07.2002
 IE 
 ITLapse: 31.07.2002
 LILapse: 31.07.2002
 LU 
 NL 
 PTLapse: 14.11.2002
 SELapse: 31.10.2002
Examination procedure15.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
European patent granted31.07.2002
Opposition procedure06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 23.07.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:706740
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
 
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990322
 
Event date:23.06.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
 
Event date:07.06.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000420
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020731
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020731
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020731
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020731
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020731
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020731
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:706740
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:221713
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020815
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:05.09.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69431133
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020905
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:02.10.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
OWNER NAME:MACROVISION CORPORATION
 
Event date:31.10.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021031
 
Event date:31.10.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021031
 
Event date:14.11.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021114
 
Event date:02.12.2002 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
OWNER NAME:MACROVISION CORPORATION
 
Event date:27.12.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:30.01.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20030130
 
Event date:14.02.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:09.05.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030509
 
Event date:20.06.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CA
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS
 
Event date:23.07.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030506
 
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:12.06.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR GC
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED
 
Event date:04.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR RG
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED
 
Event date:04.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
 
Event date:11.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR GC
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED
Effective DATE:20120410
 
Event date:12.09.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120816 AND 20120822
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20130515
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20130508
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20130510
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20130510
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20130531
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:09.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69431133 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:10.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69431133 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:21.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V4
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20140509
 
Event date:28.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20140508
 
Event date:02.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140508
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140509
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140510
 
Event date:26.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR RG
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED
Effective DATE:20140822