Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0923241

EP0923241 - Method and apparatus for defeating the effects of a video anti-copy process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MACROVISION CORPORATION
2830 De La Cruz Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]For all designated states
Macrovision Corporation
2830 De La Cruz Blvd.
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
MACROVISION CORPORATION
1341 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wonfor, Peter, J.
962 Malaga
El Granada, CA 94018 / US
02 / Knox, Alistair, J.
102 Loddon Bridge Road
Woodley, Reading Berks RG5 4AW / GB
03 / Corcoran, Jeremy, J.
76 New Peachey Lane
Cowley, Uxbridge, Middlesex UB8 3SY / GB
04 / Ryan, John, O.
22015 Creekside Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / Quan, Ronald
10910 Wunderlich Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Needle, Jacqueline
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]Needle, Jacqueline
W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date99104610.309.05.1994
[1999/24]
Priority number, dateUS1993006286617.05.1993         Original published format: US 62866
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0923241
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0923241
Date:23.06.1999
[1999/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0923241
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/91
[1999/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwindung der Effekte eines Videokopierschutzverfahrens[1999/24]
English:Method and apparatus for defeating the effects of a video anti-copy process[1999/24]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour mettre en défaut les effets d'un procédé de protection de copie vidéo[1999/24]
Examination procedure22.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/24]
20.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2002Fee for grant paid
15.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94919117.5  / EP0706740
Opposition(s)06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
IT31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT14.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/05]AT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT14.11.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2003/48]AT31.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT14.11.2002
Former [2003/46]AT31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
DK31.10.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT14.11.2002
Former [2003/31]AT31.07.2002
CH31.07.2002
GR31.07.2002
LI31.07.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT14.11.2002
Former [2003/22]GR31.07.2002
SE31.10.2002
PT14.11.2002
Former [2003/20]GR31.07.2002
SE31.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE31.10.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]DE8812594U  (ELLERBROK) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5133008  (FUJITA) [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - "MACROVISION DECODER/BLANKER", ELEKTOR ELECTRONICS, (198810), vol. 14, no. 160, pages 44 - 47, XP000046163 [A] 1-11