Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0927977

EP0927977 - Home digital audiovisual information recording and playback apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TouchTunes Music Corporation
Suite 107, 1800 East Sahara
Las Vegas, NV 89104 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]For all designated states
Touchtunes Music Corporation
Suite 107, 1800 East Sahara
Las Vegas, NV 89104 / US
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
TOUCHTUNES MUSIC CORPORATION
Suite 107, 1800 East Sahara
Las Vegas, NV 89104 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nathan, Guy
1, rue Jeanne d Arc
91330 Yerres / FR
02 / Mastronardi, Tony
4973 Felix Maclernan
Pierrefonds, Quebec H8Y 3L2 / CA
[1999/27]
Representative(s)Debay, Yves
Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2
78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR
[2013/10]
Former [1999/27]Debay, Yves
Cabinet Yves Debay, 122 Elysée 2
78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR
Application number, filing date99104682.212.10.1995
[1999/27]
Priority number, dateWO1994FR0118512.10.1994         Original published format: PCT/FR94/01185
[1999/27]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0927977
Date:07.07.1999
Language:FR
[1999/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0927977
Date:11.05.2005
[2005/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0927977
Date:06.03.2013
Language:FR
[2013/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/30, G11B27/00
[1999/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/27]
TitleGerman:Häusliches Aufnahme- und Wiedergabegerät für numerische, audiovisuelle Informationen[1999/27]
English:Home digital audiovisual information recording and playback apparatus[1999/27]
French:Appareil domestique d'enregistrement et de restitution d'informations audiovisuelles numériques[1999/27]
Examination procedure26.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
01.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
17.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2012Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2012Fee for grant paid
10.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
18.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95934693.3  / EP0786125
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950934693) is  06.10.1997
Opposition(s)09.12.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
18.01.2013Request for further processing filed
18.01.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.02.2013Decision despatched
18.01.2013Request for further processing filed
18.01.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.02.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
19.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
21.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
21.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
02.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 13
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 14
27.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 15
26.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 16
28.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 17
26.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 18
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200208   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2002
31.10.200612   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2006
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:02
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:19.09.2005
ID:03
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:02.03.2006
ID:04
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:26.02.2007
[2012/32]
Former [2008/08]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:11.01.2005
ID:02
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:19.09.2005
ID:03
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:02.03.2006
ID:04
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:26.02.2007
ID:05
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:13.12.2007
[2012/32]
Former [2007/25]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:11.01.2005
ID:02
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:19.09.2005
ID:03
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:02.03.2006
ID:04
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:26.02.2007
[2008/08]
Former [2006/19]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:11.01.2005
ID:02
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:19.09.2005
ID:03
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:02.03.2006
[2007/25]
Former [2005/48]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:11.01.2005
ID:02
For:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:19.09.2005
ID:03
For:all designated states
Date:
[2006/19]
Former [2005/17]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:11.01.2005
ID:03
For:all designated states
Date:
[2005/48]
Former [2002/50]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:06.09.2002
ID:03
For:all designated states
Date:
[2005/17]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
LU12.10.2013
BE31.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/41]DK06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
BE31.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/34]DK06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/25]DK06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2014/11]DK06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2014/09]DK06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/47]SE06.03.2013
GR07.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/37]SE06.03.2013
GR07.06.2013
Former [2013/34]SE06.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9318465  (ARACHNID INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4949187  (COHEN JASON M [US]) [A] 1,2,5,7-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2602352  (KEMPF BERTRAND [FR]) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *;
 [AP]EP0631283  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1,2,5,7,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 46 - column 8, line 5 *;
 [A]WO9120082  (ARACHNID INC [US]);
 [A]GB2193420  (PETYARD LIMITED);
 [A]US4920432  (EGGERS DEREK C [US], et al)
ExaminationDE3815071
 EP0529834
 DE3820835