blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0943605


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.12.2002  [2002/49]
25.06.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
13.04.2002 Renewal fee
21.03.2002 Examination report or reply
16.11.2001 First examination report
13.11.2001 Examination report or reply
30.03.2001 Renewal fee
09.10.2000 Change - extension states
11.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
26.05.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.07.2000 [2000/28]
03.12.1999 Publication of search report published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
06.08.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.09.1999 [1999/38]