blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0943605
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH11322699Global Dossier 24.11.1999A
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0943605Global Dossier 19.01.2000A3
EP0943605 22.09.1999A2
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2263840 13.05.2008C
CA2263840 19.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1119323C 27.08.2003C
CN1232819 27.10.1999A
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ84899 13.10.1999A3
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1023108 14.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HU223518 30.08.2004B1
HU9900699 28.09.2000A1
HU9900699D 28.05.1999D0
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL128844 06.07.2003A
IL128844D 31.01.2000D0
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IN188424 21.09.2002B
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100618365B 30.08.2006B1
KR19990077832 25.10.1999A
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PL193541B 28.02.2007B1
PL332064 27.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2225391 10.03.2004C2
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SK34399 14.02.2000A3
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI224088B 21.11.2004B
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5959136 28.09.1999A
Priority number Date
CH66598 19.03.1998