Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0943605

EP0943605 - Process for the preparation of malonitrile [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lonza AG
Münchensteinerstrasse 38
4052 Basel / CH
[1999/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Peter, Prof. Dr.
Gloriastrasse 62
8044 Zürich / CH
02 / Hoffner, Johannes, Dr.
Witikonerstrasse 503
8053 Zürich / CH
03 / Müller, André
Poststrasse 2
8954 Geroldswil / CH
04 / Fuchs, Rudolf, Dr.
Petit-Chasseur 34
1950 Sion / CH
[1999/38]
Application number, filing date99104840.611.03.1999
[1999/38]
Priority number, dateCH1998000066519.03.1998         Original published format: CH 66598
[1999/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0943605
Date:22.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0943605
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C253/00, C07C255/04
[1999/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/38]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Malonsäuredinitril[1999/38]
English:Process for the preparation of malonitrile[1999/38]
French:Procédé pour la preparation du malonitrile[1999/38]
Examination procedure06.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
15.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/49]
28.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]  SAEGUSA T ET AL, "Cationic isomerization and oligomerization of isocyanide", J. ORG. CHEM. (JOCEAH);1969; VOL.34 (12); PP.4040-6, Kyoto Univ.;Kyoto; Japan, XP002122875 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01264a062