blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0942609

EP0942609 - Data storage medium, and apparatus and method for reproducing the data from the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mori, Yoshihiro
15-14, Higashikorimotomachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Kozuka, Masayuki
19-1-1207, Ishizuminamimachi
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP
[1999/37]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard, et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]Kügele, Bernhard, et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date99104877.811.03.1999
[1999/37]
Priority number, dateJP1998006335113.03.1998         Original published format: JP 6335198
[1999/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0942609
Date:15.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0942609
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04N9/806
[1999/37]
CPC:
G11B27/34 (EP,US); H04N9/806 (KR); G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US); G11B27/329 (EP,US); H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US); H04N5/775 (EP,US); H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/21]
Former [1999/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datenspeichermedium sowie Anlage und Verfahren zur Wiedergabe der Daten davon[1999/37]
English:Data storage medium, and apparatus and method for reproducing the data from the same[1999/37]
French:Moyen d'emmagasinage de données, et appareil et procédé pour reproduire les données à partir de celui-là[1999/37]
Examination procedure31.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/37]
08.12.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
28.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
01.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.08.2001Fee for grant paid
29.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP01119794.4  / EP1164801
EP03010313.9  / EP1335613
EP05006669.5  / EP1545136
Opposition(s)01.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9713365  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0798722  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,13,19-21 * page 4, line 56 - page 5, line 53 * * page 6, line 36 - page 7, line 23 * * page 12, line 12 - line 26; figures 1,3,4,8A,8B *;
 [PA]EP0847198  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,7,13,19-21 * page 13, line 51 - page 18, line 12; figures 1,16-22 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.