Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987774

EP0987774 - An electrode having enhanced hole injection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
P.O. Box 36
Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
The Trustees of Princeton University
P.O. Box 36
Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Forrest, Stephen R.
148 Hunt Drive
Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US
02 / Gu, Gong
224 E. King Street
Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann
Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP
Franklinstrasse 46-48
60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann
Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partner Patentanwaltskanzlei Barckhausstrasse 12-16
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/51]Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr.
Meyer-Dulheuer & Ackermann Stiftstrasse 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/12]KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN
Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date99104907.312.03.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateUS1998015421616.09.1998         Original published format: US 154216
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0987774
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/20
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektrode mit erhöhter Lochinjektion[2000/12]
English:An electrode having enhanced hole injection[2000/12]
French:Electrode avec injection des trous améliorée[2000/12]
Examination procedure10.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
16.05.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/29]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200103   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.200204   M06   Not yet paid