Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0953814

EP0953814 - Hybrid cooling plant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2002  [2002/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Energietecknik GmbH
Dorstener Strasse 484
44809 Bochum / DE
[1999/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Vodicka, Vladimir, Dipl.-Ing.
Semperstrasse 41
44801 Bochum / DE
[1999/44]
Representative(s)Bockermann, Rolf
Bergstrasse 159
44791 Bochum / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/44]Bockermann, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Bergstrasse 159
44791 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date99104998.212.03.1999
[1999/44]
Priority number, dateDE199811892228.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19818922
[1999/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0953814
Date:03.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0953814
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F28C1/14
[1999/44]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/01]
Former [1999/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hybridkühlanlage[1999/44]
English:Hybrid cooling plant[1999/44]
French:Installation de refroidissement hybride[1999/44]
Examination procedure16.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
28.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/46]
11.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4442804  (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 51; figure - *;
 [A]EP0641979  (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *