Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0940224

EP0940224 - Abrasive tape [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishio, Toshikazu
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP
02 / Amemiya, Hiroyuki
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP
03 / Nakai, Yasuo
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP
04 / Ishii, Taiji
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP
05 / Yamaguchi, Masahisa
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-Ku, Tokyo 162-01 / JP
[1999/38]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99105024.602.06.1993
[1999/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0940224
Date:08.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0940224
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0940224
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B24D11/00
[1999/36]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1999/36]
TitleGerman:Schleifband[1999/36]
English:Abrasive tape[1999/36]
French:Bande abrasive[1999/36]
Examination procedure15.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/36]
20.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2002Fee for grant paid
18.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93913473.0  / EP0664187
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0523973  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5152917  (PIEPER JON R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 62 - column 10, line 32 *;
 [A]US3689187  (HIROSAWA NORIO) [A] 1 * column 5, paragraph 3; figures 16,17 *;
 [A]GB2090275  (NORTON CO) [A] 1 * claim 1 *