blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0947674


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.10.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
19.06.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
21.03.2003 Renewal fee
11.01.2003 First examination report
04.01.2003 Examination report or reply
10.04.2002 Renewal fee
16.03.2001 Renewal fee
26.02.2001 Loss of particular rights
18.10.2000 Loss of particular rights
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
07.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
21.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.09.2000 [2000/36]
26.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
26.11.1999 Change - classification published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
20.08.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.10.1999 [1999/40]