blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0947674
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0947674Global Dossier 12.01.2000A3
EP0947674 06.10.1999A2
Priority number Date
ITLC980002 03.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2137913T 01.01.2000T1
Priority number Date
ITLC980002 03.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IT1306539 11.06.2001B1
ITLC980002 04.10.1999A1
ITLC980002D 03.04.1998D0
Priority number Date
ITLC980002 03.04.1998