blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0947674

Designated contracting statesDE 
ES 
FR 
IT 
Examination procedure24.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:06.10.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE ES FR IT
 
Event date:06.10.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:01.01.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES BA2A 2137913 ES T1
Code Expl.:+PATENT APPLICATION PUBLISHED
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7F 01N 7/18 A, 7F 01N 7/16 B
 
Event date:06.09.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000707
 
Event date:20.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE ES FR IT
 
Event date:26.02.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030109
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20030520