Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0947674

EP0947674 - Muffler for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Polini Motori S.p.A.
Via Raoul Follereau, 11
24027 Nembro (BG) / IT
[1999/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Polini, Carlo
Via Grumello, 47
24020 Alzano Lombardo (BG) / IT
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Marietti, Giuseppe
Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l.
Via Larga, 16
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Marietti, Giuseppe
MARIETTI e GISLON S.r.l. Via Larga, 16
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99105157.429.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateIT1998LC0000203.04.1998         Original published format: IT LC980002
[1999/40]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0947674
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0947674
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F01N7/18, F01N7/16
[2000/02]
Former International [1999/40]F01N7/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2000/38]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schalldämpfer für eine interne Brennkraftmaschine[1999/40]
English:Muffler for internal combustion engine[1999/40]
French:Silencieux pour moteur a combustion interne[1999/40]
Examination procedure07.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/48]
24.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3516442  (LINSER JOERG PROF DIPL ING FH) [X] 1-4,11,12,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE1476491  (DURALUMIN) [X] 1,2,11,12 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9717531  (ACTS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,11,13 * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 29; figures 1,2 *;
 [PX]EP0897060  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS59108815  ;
 [A]US4084658  (MURPHY MILO E) [A] 1-4,11-13 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 20; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0513850  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,11,14,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841018), vol. 008, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 332), [A] 1,3,4,7,11,13 * abstract *