Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974799

EP0974799 - Process for drying fibrous webs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/51]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Egelhof, Dieter
Lucas-Cranach-Strasse 15
89520 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date99105158.229.03.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199812784323.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19827843
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974799
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974799
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:F26B13/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   SE [2002/35]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Trocknung von Faserstoffbahnen[2000/04]
English:Process for drying fibrous webs[2000/04]
French:Procédé de séchage de bandes fibreuses[2000/04]
Examination procedure05.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/32]
30.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/24]
14.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE1610921  (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document * [Y] 4;
 [XAY]DE1206718  (BELOIT IRON WORKS) [X] 1,9,11 * the whole document * [A] 7 [Y] 10;
 [Y]US5557860  (KOTITSCHKE GERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * column W *;
 [Y]EP0708301  (GASTEC NV [NL]) [Y] 10 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0808942  (JAMES RIVER CORP [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19533673  (TECH UNI CHEMNITZ ZWICKAU I FU [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3793741  (SMITH H);
 [A]EP0489720  (KRIEGER CORP [US]);
 [A]DE4313543  (VITS MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE])