Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971150

EP0971150 - Method of cooling bicycle disk brake [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai
Osaka 590 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Shimano Inc.
77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai
Osaka 590 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Yasushi
8-3-2-604, Nishino
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date99105300.015.03.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011040806.07.1998         Original published format: US 110408
US1998011170808.07.1998         Original published format: US 111708
US1998011170908.07.1998         Original published format: US 111709
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971150
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971150
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/853, B62L1/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/39]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  LI 
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kühlverfahren für eine Fahrrad-Scheibenbremse[2000/02]
English:Method of cooling bicycle disk brake[2000/02]
French:Méthode de refroidissement pour frein à disque de bicyclette[2000/02]
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE
19.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC
29.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2003Fee for grant paid
06.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5445242  (POGORZELSKI THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-8,15-17,19,27 * column A; figures 1-4 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 19 *;
 [A]JPH0694060  ;
 [A]US4391352  (BROWN LAWRENCE G [US]) [A] 1-6,19 * column 3, line 13 - line 68; figures 1,2,10 * * column 13, line 33 - line 66 *;
 [A]JPS62278330  ;
 CN1058570  [ ] (LUO JIANHUA [CN]);
 [PA]DE19807392  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [PA] 8,9,20,21 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 44 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940708), vol. 018, no. 363, Database accession no. (M - 1635), [A] 1,2,4-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880514), vol. 012, no. 160, Database accession no. (M - 697), [A] 1,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE EPODOC, European Patent Office, XP002117716 [A] 8-10,19,20,24,27 * abstract *