Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0948102

EP0948102 - Card edge connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28, Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murakami, Takao c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
206-1, Nunobikibara, Haibaracho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka, 421-0407 / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Masaya c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
206-1, Nunobikibara, Haibaracho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka, 421-0407 / JP
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date99105485.917.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateJP1998008753831.03.1998         Original published format: JP 8753898
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0948102
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0948102
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0948102
Date:14.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/18, H01R13/26, H01R13/502
[2002/32]
Former International [1999/40]H01R23/70, H01R13/26, H01R13/502
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leiterplattenrandverbinder[1999/40]
English:Card edge connector[1999/40]
French:Connecteur de bord de carte[1999/40]
Examination procedure25.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
12.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2002Fee for grant paid
19.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0637857  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 14, line 41 - column 20, line 15; figures 8-14 *;
 [A]FR2310061  (BONHOMME F R [FR]) [A] 1-5 * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 29; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]US4148537  (SOCHOR JERZY R)