Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963923

EP0963923 - Refuse collection vehicle with side-mounted lifting and tipping device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FAUN Umwelttechnik GmbH & Co.
Stefanstrasse 2
58638 Iserlohn / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
Faun Umwelttechnik GmbH & Co.
Stefanstrasse 2
58638 Iserlohn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Strietzel, Roland, Prof.Dr.Ing.habil.
Pestitzer Weg 8
01217 Dresden / DE
02 / Kolbe, Edgar, Dipl.-Ing.
Ernst-Zielinskie-Strasse 34
07745 Jena / DE
03 / Ehrich, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing.
Burgstrasse 66
07751 Rothenstein/Oelknitz / DE
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Laufhütte, Dieter , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99105551.818.03.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateDE1998208379U08.05.1998         Original published format: DE 29808379 U
[1999/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0963923
Date:15.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0963923
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0963923
Date:02.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65F3/04
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/03]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Müllsammelfahrzeug mit seitlich angebrachter Hubkippvorrichtung[1999/50]
English:Refuse collection vehicle with side-mounted lifting and tipping device[1999/50]
French:Véhicule de ramassage d'ordures avec dispositif de levage-basculage latéral[1999/50]
Examination procedure11.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
07.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2003Fee for grant paid
11.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK02.09.2004
PT02.11.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2005/22]DK02.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19510359  (OTTO GEB KG [DE]) [A] 1,3-6 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 17 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0818403  (ZOELLER KIPPER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 43 - line 50 *;
 [PX]DE29808379U  (FAUN UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP0955252  (ZOELLER KIPPER [DE]) [E] 1,4,5 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *
by applicantEP0463386
 EP0388618
 EP0700840