Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0943751

EP0943751 - A method of releasably attaching coverings with tolerance compensation onto supporting rasters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/38]A method of releasably attaching coverings with tolerance compensation onto supporting rasters, and a product made using such a method
[2005/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM LHB GmbH
Postfach 41 11 60
38233 Salzgitter / DE
[1999/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Meyer, Dieter
Hegelstrasse 6
31224 Peine / DE
[1999/38]
Application number, filing date99105587.218.03.1999
[1999/38]
Priority number, dateDE199811179218.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19811792
[1999/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0943751
Date:22.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0943751
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0943751
Date:23.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E04F13/08, F16B21/08
[1999/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/41]
Former [1999/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur lösbaren Befestigung von Verkleidungsteilen mit Toleranzausgleich an Trägern mit Aufnahmerastern[2005/25]
English:A method of releasably attaching coverings with tolerance compensation onto supporting rasters[2005/25]
French:Procédé pour l'attachement amovible d'éléments de revêtement à compensation des tolérances sur des réseaux support[2005/25]
Former [1999/38]Verfahren zur lösbaren Befestigung von Verkleidungsteilen mit Toleranzausgleich an Trägern mit Aufnahmerastern sowie ein nach diesem Verfahren hergestelltes Erzeugnis
Former [1999/38]A method of releasably attaching coverings with tolerance compensation onto supporting rasters, and a product made using such a method
Former [1999/38]Procédé pour l'attachement amovible d'éléments de revêtement à compensation des tolérances sur des réseaux support, et produit fabriqué selon ce procédé
Examination procedure26.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
04.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2005Fee for grant paid
12.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI23.11.2005
DK23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
BE31.03.2006
[2007/18]
Former [2006/35]FI23.11.2005
DK23.02.2006
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI23.11.2005
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/24]FI23.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2206772  (LEPELLEY ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 26; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]DE1953961  (GERHARD WONNEMANN GMBH) [A] 1,2,5 * page 12, line 6 - page 18, line 25; figures 1,6-10 *;
 [A]DE3841179  (HUELSTA WERKE HUELS KG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2327605  (RYDER CHARLES D) [A] 1-3,5 * page 1, column R, line 51 - page 3, column L, line 25; figures 1-6 *
by applicantDE3344995