blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0945973

EP0945973 - Control device for a single phase synchronous motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.05.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.06.2003  [2003/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG
Pfannerstrasse 75-79
88239 Wangen im Allgäu / DE
[2000/22]
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
AKO-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Pfannerstrasse 75
88239 Wangen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zeh, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing.
Karl-Saurmann-Strasse 71
88239 Wangen / DE
[1999/39]
Representative(s)Hofmann, Gerhard
Patentassessor
Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/39]Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor
Stephanstrasse 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99105656.519.03.1999
[1999/39]
Priority number, dateDE199811309525.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19813095
[1999/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0945973
Date:29.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0945973
Date:13.06.2001
[2001/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0945973
Date:26.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2001
ClassificationIPC:H02P1/46
[1999/39]
CPC:
H02P6/22 (EP); H02P1/465 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/10]
Former [1999/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Steuern eines Einphasen-Synchronmotors[1999/39]
English:Control device for a single phase synchronous motor[1999/39]
French:Dispositif de commande pour un moteur synchrone monophase[1999/39]
Examination procedure09.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
05.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2002Fee for grant paid
14.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]FR2653613  (EATON CONTROLS SA [FR]) [DA] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 3, line 34; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [DA]EP0654890  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * abstract * * column 8, line 2 - column 8, line 56; figure 8 *;
 [A]DE3638440  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2,4; claim 1 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 36 *;
 [A]JPS61240868  ;
 [A]EP0682404  (SISME [IT]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0666639  (MUEHLEGGER WERNER DR [AT]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 2, line 33 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870318), vol. 011, no. 088, Database accession no. (E - 490), & JP61240868 A 19861027 (MATSUSHITA SEIKO CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.