EP0945539 - Method and device for continuous alkali treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Textilforschungsinstitut Thüringer-Vogtland e.V. Zeulenrodaer Strasse 42 07973 Greiz / DE | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellwich, Brigitte Leubnitzerstrasse 28 08539 Mehltheuer / DE | 02 /
Hellwich, Hartmut Leubnitzerstrasse 28 08539 Mehltheuer / DE | [2000/46] |
Former [1999/39] | 01 /
Hellwich, Brigitte Morgenbergstrasse 22 08525 Plauen / DE | ||
02 /
Hellwich, Hartmut Morgenbergstrasse 22 08525 Plauen / DE | Representative(s) | Weidelt, Manfred Meissner, Bolte & Partner Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 15 07545 Gera / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Weidelt, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Patentanwalt, Ruckdeschelstrasse 17 07551 Gera / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105825.6 | 23.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | DE1998113237 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19813237 | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0945539 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945539 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D06B7/08 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
D06B7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/24] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Alkalibehandlung | [1999/39] | English: | Method and device for continuous alkali treatment | [1999/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement alcalin continu | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.02.2001 | NL | 28.02.2001 | ES | 29.08.2001 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/05] | NL | 28.02.2001 | |
ES | 29.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 28.02.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4213127 (BABCOCK TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH) [DA] 1,4 * figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *; | [DA]EP0340166 (BENNINGER AG MASCHF [CH]); | [DA]DE19635171 (TITV GREIZ [DE]); | [A]DE2544494 (KLEINEWEFERS IND CO GMBH); | [A]DE2014867 (TEXTILWERKE JOSEF OTTEN) |