blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970761
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3105886BGlobal Dossier 06.11.2000B2
JP2000015310 18.01.2000A
Priority number Date
US11070298 07.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0970761Global Dossier 18.07.2001A3
EP0970761 12.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
US11070298 07.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2267538 07.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11070298 07.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5924319 20.07.1999A
Priority number Date
US11070298 07.07.1998