Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970761

EP0970761 - Roll crossing, offsetting, bending and shifting system for rolling mills [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Danieli United, A division of Danieli Corporation
400 Holiday Drive Pittsburgh
Pennsylvania 15220-2727 / US
For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL ROLLING MILL CONSULTANTS, INC.
612, Driftwood Drive Pittsburgh
Pennsylvania 15238 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Danieli United, A division of Danieli Corporation
400 Holiday Drive
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15220-2727 / US
For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL ROLLING MILL CONSULTANTS, INC.
612, Driftwood Drive
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15238 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ginzburg, Vladimir B.
612 Driftwood Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99105849.623.03.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011070207.07.1998         Original published format: US 110702
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970761
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0970761
Date:18.07.2001
[2001/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B21B13/02, B21B31/16, B21B29/00, B21B37/28, B21B31/18
[2001/29]
Former International [2000/02]B21B13/02, B21B31/16, B21B29/00, B21B37/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/15]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zum Kreuzen, Versetzen, Biegen und Verschieben von Walzen für Walzwerke[2000/02]
English:Roll crossing, offsetting, bending and shifting system for rolling mills[2000/02]
French:Système pour croiser, décaler, cintrer et déplacer des cylindres pour laminoirs[2000/02]
Examination procedure23.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
19.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/33]
07.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPS61249610  ;
 [XA]JPH08197109  ;
 [A]EP0707902  (CLECIM SA [FR]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 6, line 8 - column 13, line 25; figure - *;
 [A]JPH05277528  ;
 [DA]JPS61259812  ;
 [DA]JPH0760310  ;
 [A]US5655398  (GINZBURG VLADIMIR B [US]) [A] 1,7,10-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 17 *;
 [A]US4898014  (GINZBURG VLADIMIR B [US], et al) [A] 1,7-14 * column 2, line 44 - column 6, line 10; figure - *;
 [A]JPH06142714  ;
 [A]JPS59156509
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870331), vol. 011, no. 102, Database accession no. (M - 576), [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * [A] 10
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * [A]
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940126), vol. 018, no. 051, Database accession no. (M - 1548), [A] 1-4 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870410), vol. 011, no. 114, Database accession no. (M - 579), [DA] 1,7,8,10 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, [DA] 1-4,7,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940819), vol. 018, no. 446, Database accession no. (M - 1659), [A] 5,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850109), vol. 009, no. 003, Database accession no. (M - 349), [A] 9 * abstract *