Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0947171

EP0947171 - Flexible metal probe for use in intracorporal shock wave lithotripsy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferton Holding S.A.
Rue de L'Avenir 23
2800 Delemont / CH
[2003/22]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
Ferton Holding
Rue de l'Avenir 23
2800 Delemont / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Jerger, Thomas
Goldbergstrasse 9
71065 Sindelfingen / DE
02 / Horn, Uwe
Reutestrasse 104
78467 Konstanz / DE
03 / Goin, Emanuel
Montagibert 16
1005 Lausanne / CH
04 / Menne, Andreas
Rebhalde 3
88079 Meersburg / DE
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Müller, Frank Peter , et al
Müller Schupfner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]Müller, Frank Peter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Patentanwälte Postfach 10 11 61
80085 München / DE
Former [1999/40]Gauger, Hans-Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Müller, Schupfner & Gauger, Maximilianstrasse 6
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date99105859.523.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateDE199811439531.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19814395
[1999/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0947171
Date:06.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0947171
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0947171
Date:23.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/22
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/01]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flexible Metallsonde zur Verwendung bei der intrakorporalen Stosswellen-Lithotripsie[1999/40]
English:Flexible metal probe for use in intracorporal shock wave lithotripsy[1999/40]
French:Sonde flexible en métal utilisée pour la lithotripsie intracorporelle à ondes de chocs[1999/40]
Examination procedure29.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
27.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
22.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2003Fee for grant paid
14.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5387190  (GOTANDA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [AD]EP0317507  (FAVRE ROBERT) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4414903  (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - line 38; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4823793  (ANGULO EARL D [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0421285
 US3830240
by applicantEP0317507