EP0968751 - Liquid circulation system for a scrubbing liquid used for neutralisation and separation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAS-DÜNNSCHICHT ANLAGEN SYSTEME GmbH DRESDEN Gostritzer Strasse 61-63 D-01217 Dresden / DE | For all designated states VSS- Umwelttechnik GmbH Mottmannstrasse 6a 53842 Troisdorf / DE | For all designated states K- Kunststoffsystems GmbH Feinchenswiese 8a 56424 Staudt / DE | [2005/46] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states DAS-DÜNNSCHICHT ANLAGEN SYSTEME GmbH DRESDEN Gostritzer Strasse 61-63 D-01217 Dresden / DE | ||
For all designated states VSS- Umwelttechnik GmbH Mottmannstrasse 6a 53842 Troisdorf / DE | |||
For all designated states K- Kunststoffsystems GmbH Feinchenswiese 8a 56424 Staudt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichardt, Horst, Dr. Kleinsteinstrasse 14 01219 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Gehmlich, Konrad Huttenburgweg 8 01662 Meissen / DE | 03 /
Hofmann, Gerold Berchtesgadener Strasse 47 01279 Dresden / DE | 04 /
Wiesenberg, Wido Am Torfmoor 7b 01109 Dresden / DE | 05 /
Merforth, Egbert Martin-Luther-Platz 11 01099 Dresden / DE | 06 /
Firkert, Günter Malterstrasse 54 01159 Dresden / DE | 07 /
Wilde, Michael Clausen-Dahl-Strasse 39 01219 Dresden / DE | 08 /
Ritter, Tilmann Hellerauer Strasse 1 01129 Dresden / DE | 09 /
Vosen, Michael Fuchsweg 9c 50859 Köln-Lövenicht / DE | 10 /
Roos, Christoph Junkernstrasse 2 56235 Ransbach-Baumbach / DE | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105976.7 | 25.03.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | DE1998129160 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19829160 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968751 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968751 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/78, B01D53/74, B01D53/68, B01J19/24 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
B01D53/74 (EP);
B01D53/78 (EP);
B01J19/2465 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/37] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitskreislauf für eine Waschflüssigkeit zur Neutralisation und Abscheidung | [2000/01] | English: | Liquid circulation system for a scrubbing liquid used for neutralisation and separation | [2000/01] | French: | Circulation de liquide pour un liquide de lavage utilisé pour neutralisation et séparation | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 06.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 06.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.11.2005 | GB | 16.11.2005 | IT | 16.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | GB | 16.11.2005 | |
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
FR | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | GB | 16.11.2005 | |
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/18] | GB | 16.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4003370 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 46 *; | [A]WO9724172 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1* page 6, line 25 - page 10, line 25 *; | [DA]EP0801970 (KT KUNSTSTOFFTECH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 12 * |