Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0948141

EP0948141 - Decoding device for multichannel audio bitstream [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sueyoshi, Masahiro
1-32-11, Kitayama
Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Matsumoto, Masaharu
5-5-3-403, Hoshidanishi
Katano-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Miyasaka, Shuji
19-4, Narita-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP
04 / Fujita, Takeshi
3-15-101-302, Kamihamuro
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka / JP
05 / Katayama, Takashi
6-3-308, Myokenzaka
Katano-shi, Osaka / JP
06 / Abe, Kazutaka
25-3, Mido-cho
Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP
07 / Nishio, Kosuke
22-7, Korinishino-cho
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP
08 / Kawamura, Akihisa
1-18-21-504, Higashinakaburi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP
09 / Ishito, Tsukuru
16-35, Uzumasahiriike-cho, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP
10 / Nakamura, Tsuyoshi
1100-1, Onaka, Sasagurimachi
Kasuya-gun, Fukuoka-ken / JP
11 / Otomura, Eiji
2-16-2-102, Hirata
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP
[1999/40]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date99106068.226.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateJP1998008336330.03.1998         Original published format: JP 8336398
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0948141
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0948141
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0948141
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/66, H04N7/52
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/13]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Dekodierung eines Mehrkanalaudiobitstroms[1999/40]
English:Decoding device for multichannel audio bitstream[1999/40]
French:Dispositif de décodage d'un flux de données audio multicanal[1999/40]
Examination procedure20.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
27.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2005Fee for grant paid
09.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PA]EP0847155  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,8,9,11 * claim 7 *;
 [PA]EP0883125  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PA] 1,8,9,11 * page 2, line 11 - line 13 * * page 3, line 18 - line 20 * * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 9 * * page 7, line 17; table 1 * * page 12, line 14 - line 15 * * page 12, line 24 - line 29 *
 [A]  SCHROEDER E F ET AL, "DER MPEG-2-STANDARD: GENERISCHE CODIERUNG FUER BEWEGTBILDER UND ZUGEHOERIGE AUDIO-INFORMATION. AUDIO-CODIERUNG (TEIL 4)", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, (19940830), vol. 48, no. 7/08, ISSN 0015-0142, pages 364 - 368,370-373, XP000460964 [A] 1,8,9,11 * page 366 - page 367 * * page 372 *