Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0950397 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0950397



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 630
02.07.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
27.06.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.06.2012 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
19.06.2012 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
24.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.05.2012 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 14
18.05.2012 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 3
01.02.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 15
04.01.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
23.12.2011 Authorisation Appeal 2
23.12.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
12.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
12.11.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
11.11.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.11.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.11.2011 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 10
03.11.2011 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.10.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
26.07.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.07.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
12.07.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
03.05.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
27.04.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.03.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
17.03.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
26.02.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
30.11.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
24.11.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.11.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.10.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
21.10.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.10.2009 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
21.10.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
21.10.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.10.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.10.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.10.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.10.2009 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
09.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.09.2009 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
05.02.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.07.2008 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
25.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 4
16.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
28.02.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.02.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
20.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.12.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.10.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.06.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.06.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.06.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.05.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.05.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.05.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.04.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.04.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
27.04.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
27.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.04.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
26.04.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
26.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
26.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
26.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
26.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
25.04.2006 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 5
16.06.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.02.2005 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
19.02.2005 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.12.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.12.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
15.12.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
03.12.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.12.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.12.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.12.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.10.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
21.10.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.10.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.10.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.10.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
26.02.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.02.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.02.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.02.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.08.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.08.2003 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
01.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.07.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
02.06.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.03.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.10.1999 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.09.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.06.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
25.06.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
27.05.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
01.04.1999 Description Search / examination 30
01.04.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 Priority document Search / examination 35
01.04.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6