Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045037

EP1045037 - Plant cell identification system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2001
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DISCOVERY BIOTECH., INC.
372 Suey-Tang Road Shin-Ying City
Tainan / TW
For all designated states
Kao, Chien-Yuan
7th Floor, Nr.30, Lane 23, Section 1 Chien-Kuo N. Road
Taipei / TW
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
DISCOVERY BIOTECH., INC.
372 Suey-Tang Road
Shin-Ying City, Tainan / TW
For all designated states
Kao, Chien-Yuan
7th Floor, Nr.30, Lane 23, Section 1 Chien-Kuo N. Road
Taipei / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Kao, Chien-Yuan
7th Fl., 30,Lane 23,Sec.1 Chien-Kuo N. Road
Taipei / TW
 [2007/32]
Former [2000/42]01 / Kao, Chien-Yuan
7th Fl.,#30,Lane 23,Sec.1 Chien-Kuo N. Road
Taipei / TW
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99106213.412.04.1999
[2000/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1045037
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12N15/10
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/27]
Former [2000/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zu Identifizierung von Planzenzellen[2000/42]
English:Plant cell identification system[2000/42]
French:Système d'identification des cellules vegetales[2000/42]
Examination procedure20.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
20.09.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
29.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
10.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/42]
15.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9617954  (PABIO ;ALESTROEM PETER (NO)) [Y] 1-20 * page 28, line 30 - page 32 *;
 [Y]WO9855648  (SENSTAD TOM ;ALESTROEM PETER (NO); CHEMTAG AS (NO)) [Y] 1-20 * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11 *;
 [Y]WO9855657  (CELLSTORE ;GIFFORD DAVID K (US)) [Y] 1-20 * page 1 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 12 *;
 [Y]  - TINLAND B ET AL, "THE AGROBACTERIUM TUMEFACIENS VIRULENCE D2 PROTEIN IS RESPONSIBLE FOR PRECISE INTEGRATION OF T-DNA INTO THE PLANT GENOME", EMBO JOURNAL,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, vol. 14, no. 14, ISSN 0261-4189, page 3585-3595, XP002024242 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - SMITH R H ET AL, "AGROBACTERIUM TUMEFACIENS TRANSFORMATION OF MONOCOTYLEDONS", CROP SCIENCE,US,CROP SCIENCE SOCIETY OF AMERICA, MADISON, WI, vol. 35, no. 2, ISSN 0011-183X, page 301-309, XP002912851 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *