Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992791

EP0992791 - Method and apparatus for measuring moisture in wall materials with signal analysing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut für angewandte Informatik im Bauwesen e.V.
Philipp-Müller-Strasse 12
23966 Wismar / DE
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Fehlauer, Klaus-Uwe, Prof. Dr. rer. nat
Am Burgwall 15
23966 Wismar / DE
02 / Schwarz, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing.
John-Brinckmann-Strasse 16
18233 Neubukow / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Schnick, Achim
Schnick & Garrels Patentanwälte Schonenfahrerstrasse 7
18057 Rostock / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Schnick, Achim
Schnick & Fiebig Patentanwälte Schonenfahrerstrasse 7
18057 Rostock / DE
Application number, filing date99106391.827.03.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814624108.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846241
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992791
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992791
Date:05.06.2002
[2002/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/10, G01N33/38, G01N29/04, G01N19/10, G01N22/04
[2002/23]
Former International [2000/15]G01N29/10
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/09]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Feuchtemessung an Mauerwerksmaterialien mit Signalanalyse[2000/15]
English:Method and apparatus for measuring moisture in wall materials with signal analysing[2000/15]
French:Méthode et appareil pour la mesure d'humidité dans des matériaux pour murs avec analyse de signaux[2000/15]
Examination procedure06.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/36]
02.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.01.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.01.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5614670  (NAZARIAN SOHEIL [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 49 * * column 6, line 6 - line 61 * * column 17, line 15 - column 18, line 56; table V *;
 [A]US4881405  (PAQUET JEAN [FR]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 6 - column 5, line 40 *;
 [DA]DE4233958  (GEOTRON ELEKTRONIK ROLF KROMPH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE4117091  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 22; claim 1 *