Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971527

EP0971527 - E-mail converting apparatus, internet facsimile apparatus, and e-mail transmission method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.09.2010  [2010/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Communications Co., Ltd.
4-1-62, Minoshima, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi
Fukuoka 812-8531 / JP
[2009/43]
Former [2003/46]For all designated states
Panasonic Communications Co., Ltd.
4-1-62, Minoshima, Hakata-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8531 / JP
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, INC.
3-8, Shimomeguro 2-chome
Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8687 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Onuma, Asahiro
5-20-6-1316, Kitasuna, Koto-ku
Tokyo 136-0073 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99106642.431.03.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019566710.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19566798
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971527
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971527
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971527
Date:21.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/43]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Umwandlungsgerät für E-Mail, Fax-Gerät für Internet, und Verfahren zur Sendung von E-Mails[2000/02]
English:E-mail converting apparatus, internet facsimile apparatus, and e-mail transmission method[2000/02]
French:Appareil convertiseur d'e-mails, appareil de facsimilés par internet, et méthode de transmissions d'e-mails[2000/02]
Examination procedure14.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
23.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2009Fee for grant paid
03.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0880268  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3,5-7,9-16,18-20,22-28 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 52 *;
 [A]US5675507  (BOBO II CHARLES R [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * figures 4,6 *;
 [A]WO9710668  (KULAKOWSKI ROBERT T [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0835021  (MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUNIC [JP]) [A] 1-28 * abstract *