Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991050

EP0991050 - Method of manufacturing a screen made of a plurality of flat display panels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/14]Method of manufacturing a screen made of a plurality of flat display panels and heat radiator mechanism for flat display panels
[2004/05]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimura, Kazuo
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / Hemmi, Kazuhisa
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / Ogura, Kazumasa
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Popp, Eugen , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Popp, Eugen , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2000/14]Popp, Eugen, Dr. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date99106697.801.04.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateJP1998027715230.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27715298
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991050
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0991050
Date:27.09.2000
[2000/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G09F9/313, H01J17/49, H01J17/28
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/24]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines, aus einer Mehrzahl von flachen Anzeigetafeln gebildetes Bildschirms[2004/05]
English:Method of manufacturing a screen made of a plurality of flat display panels[2004/05]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un écran constitué d'une pluralité de panneaux d'affichage plats[2004/05]
Former [2000/14]Verfahren zur Herstellung eines, aus einer Mehrzahl von flachen Anzeigetafeln gebildetes Bildschirms und Wärmeabfuhrvorrichtung für flache Anzeigetafeln
Former [2000/14]Method of manufacturing a screen made of a plurality of flat display panels and heat radiator mechanism for flat display panels
Former [2000/14]Procédé de fabrication d'un écran constitué d'une pluralité de panneaux d'affichage plats et dispositif radiateur de chaleur pour panneaux d'affichage plats
Examination procedure27.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
28.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.07.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
27.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.05.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.05.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9844531  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH0832904  ;
 [A]JPH03160488  ;
 [A]US3828215  (BILSBACK M) [A] 1,3 * column 6, lines 50-55; figure 4 *;
 [A]JPH04274141
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, [A] 1,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911009), vol. 015, no. 399, Database accession no. (P - 1261), [A] 1,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930212), vol. 017, no. 071, Database accession no. (E - 1319), [A] 1,3 * abstract *